ALTON CHRISTIAN CARE LIMITED

Charity number: 1151471
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THELMA MARGARET THOMAS Trustee 10 October 2018 None on record
PAUL KENNETH SUSANS Trustee 17 January 2013
STEP (UK) - SEEKING TO EQUIP PEOPLE UK Received: On time
Citizens Advice East Hampshire Limited Received: On time
BUTTS EVANGELICAL CHURCH TRUST
TIMOTHY PINCHEN Chair 05 May 2013
Citizens Advice East Hampshire Limited Received: On time
Deidre Weideman Trustee 17 January 2014 None on record
ELISABETH BARBARA DUNCAN Trustee 07 May 2013 None on record
ROBIN LINCOLN KEMP Trustee 01 May 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE RESURRECTION, ALTON Received: On time
SOTERIA TRUST Received: On time