THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARYS CHURCH WOOTTON BEDS

Charity number: 1150817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 November 2019 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 November 2019 20 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time Download