THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARYS CHURCH WOOTTON BEDS

Charity number: 1150817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £365.20k £140.00k £138.58k £190.68k £161.06k
Total expenditure £176.21k £151.94k £147.13k £167.13k £151.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A