THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARYS CHURCH WOOTTON BEDS

Charity number: 1150817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Phillip Andrew Young Trustee 30 June 2019 None on record
TIMOTHY JAMES DILLSTONE Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
The Revd Canon Peter Michael Ackroyd Chair 08 January 2013
THE ST ALBANS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
CHARITY CONSISTING OF THE PROPERTY CONSTITUTING THE ENDOWMENT OF THE ORIGINAL CHURCH AND POOR'S LAND CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF ROBERT EDWARD LUNNISS Received: On time
STOWE SCHOOL LIMITED Received: On time
Annette Elizabeth Hart Trustee 08 April 2019 None on record
Rev Austen Atkins Trustee 08 April 2019 None on record
Amanda Newton Trustee 18 March 2018 None on record
ROBB HAMILTON Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Anthony Charles Hall Trustee 18 April 2016 None on record
Jenny Yang Trustee 08 April 2019 None on record
PAULINE YVONNE KENDALL Trustee 08 January 2017 None on record
Abi Holyoak Trustee 28 September 2020 None on record
Jennifer Elizabeth Roffey Trustee 08 April 2019 None on record
HAZEL CATHERINE SANDERS Trustee 08 January 2013 None on record
Charles Ashbrook Trustee 28 September 2020 None on record
James Hignett Trustee 19 June 2017 None on record
Matthew Robert Hearn Trustee 28 September 2020 None on record