OPEN DOOR (OXFORD)

Charity number: 1150626
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 02 August 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 15 August 2019 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 24 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required