WAVENEY FOODBANK

Charity number: 1151679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £25.89k £11.98k £22.43k £62.75k £201.93k
Total expenditure £12.10k £17.54k £18.82k £33.14k £43.68k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £800 £3.00k £3.50k N/A