WAVENEY FOODBANK

Charity number: 1151679

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Eleanor Mary Goodison Trustee 01 July 2020
PEMBROKE COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE MISSION Received: On time
PEMBROKE COLLEGE SETTLEMENT Received: On time
Gilliam Frostick Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Rev Pamela Bayliss Trustee 26 February 2019 None on record
Gina Cole Trustee 26 February 2019 None on record
Caroline BLACKER Trustee 26 February 2019 None on record
KEVIN GUNN Trustee 30 October 2018 None on record
David Ashley Wells Trustee 01 November 2020 None on record