SUNBEAMS PLAY

Charity number: 1152188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 24 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 24 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 24 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 24 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 13 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 13 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 22 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 22 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 24 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 24 March 2017 On time Download