Financial history SUNBEAMS PLAY

Charity number: 1152188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £193.94k £165.66k £196.26k £156.68k £263.28k
Total expenditure £191.72k £188.51k £176.67k £156.84k £178.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £17.39k N/A