Trustees SUNBEAMS PLAY

Charity number: 1152188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Benjamin James Dorsett Chair 25 July 2018
None on record
Samantha Clair Corrigan Trustee 21 January 2021
None on record
Samantha Osborne Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Cameron James Barlow Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Charles Jonathon Watt Trustee 29 October 2018
None on record
David John Warner Trustee 22 August 2016
None on record