Financial history ALL-ABOARD! WATER SPORT AND WATER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITY (BRISTOL)

Charity number: 1151374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £266.34k £260.75k £253.13k £217.72k £301.47k
Total expenditure £269.06k £288.78k £317.64k £213.06k £244.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.10k N/A N/A £49.48k £34.28k