Trustees ALL-ABOARD! WATER SPORT AND WATER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITY (BRISTOL)

Charity number: 1151374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline Susan Fionda Chair 17 April 2020
None on record
Karen Dursley Trustee 10 March 2022
None on record
PETER GOLDING Trustee 01 May 2017
CLIFTON CHILDREN'S SOCIETY
Received: On time
Gillian Hannan Trustee 27 February 2017
THE SCOBELL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Simon Chapman Trustee 09 March 2016
None on record
Timothy Paul Stevenson Trustee 31 March 2014
None on record