Accounts and annual returns THE SHEBA PROJECT LTD

Charity number: 1151496
Charity reporting is overdue by 390 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 390 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 390 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 12 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 12 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 June 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required