CROWTHORNE OLD AGE TO TEEN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1152306
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.70k £15.70k £15.70k £15.70k £18.50k
Other income £300.87k £204.54k £198.99k £214.11k £258.68k
Total expenditure £195.89k £192.91k £202.24k £224.60k £704.47k