CROWTHORNE OLD AGE TO TEEN SOCIETY

Charity number: 1152306
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Rene Hutterli Trustee 20 May 2019 None on record
David Wilson Trustee 21 January 2019 None on record
YVONNE LAVINIA HATTERSLEY Trustee 18 April 2013 None on record
Roger Bruce Fox Trustee 11 January 2017 None on record
ROBERT PATRICK BANKS SKINNER Trustee 18 April 2013 None on record
HILARY MARGARET TINSLEY Trustee 21 November 2016 None on record
MARTIN MACALPINE RICKARDS Trustee 18 April 2013
HART MALE VOICE CHOIR Charity reporting is up to date
Catherine Mary Behan Trustee 18 January 2021 None on record
RICHARD MICHAEL COX Trustee 18 April 2013 None on record