FOOTPRINTS IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1153121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £127.93k £108.08k £257.44k £205.83k £409.12k
Total expenditure £97.88k £146.59k £184.59k £182.40k £281.26k
Income from government contracts £25.00k £25.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £25.00k £25.00k £25.00k