FOOTPRINTS IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1153121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VANESSA NEWLANDS Trustee 04 April 2017 None on record
Jeremy David Faulkner Trustee 27 January 2015
OXFORD UNITED IN THE COMMUNITY
DAVID STONES Trustee 05 August 2015 None on record
Rev Kevin Highfield Trustee 22 June 2021
THE METHODIST CHURCH - CLEVELAND AND DANBY CIRCUIT Received: On time
DEREK FARRELL Trustee 20 March 2014 None on record
TIM MYER Chair 02 May 2013 None on record
Claire Stollery Trustee 09 September 2019 None on record
MARGARET MACLAREN Trustee 04 June 2018 None on record
STEPHEN DUFFIELD Trustee 04 June 2018 None on record
GILLIAN MARY DAY Trustee 02 May 2013 None on record