COUNCIL OF SOMALI ORGANISATIONS

Charity number: 1154667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 March 2019 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 December 2016 On time Download