COUNCIL OF SOMALI ORGANISATIONS

Charity number: 1154667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £100.51k £115.07k £79.32k £94.86k £66.62k
Total expenditure £98.68k £97.92k £87.71k £82.49k £82.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A