BD4 COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1152702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £103.35k £52.81k £109.22k £96.57k £125.02k
Total expenditure £83.64k £82.62k £92.29k £91.04k £106.99k
Income from government contracts £17.35k £17.35k £17.32k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £17.35k £9.85k