BD4 COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1152702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lisa Normington Chair 19 February 2014 None on record
JO MEDD Trustee 20 May 2013 None on record
Rev Timothy Charles Rank Thomas Trustee 15 September 2017 None on record
Lorna Ruth Brickman Trustee 17 October 2014 None on record
Collette Cousins Trustee 15 January 2021 None on record