Trustees THE ROYAL VETERINARY COLLEGE STUDENTS' UNION
Charity number: 1153002
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Legend Thurman | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Praavenya Kona | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Helen Hill | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pak Kan Tang | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chantelle Woodward-Iles | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Priya Kaur Toor | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jade Urquhart-Gilmore | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gareth Jones | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.