Accounts and annual returns PORTUGUESE COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1157249
Charity reporting is overdue by 1338 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 242 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 242 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 May 2020 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 April 2019 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1338 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window