THE FRIENDS OF HALESWORTH COUNTY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1153765
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline Williams Trustee 10 June 2021 None on record
Yvonne Sandison Trustee 04 May 2017
I MADE THIS (EDUCATION THROUGH THE ARTS) Received: On time
SHEILA CONSTANCE FREEMAN Trustee 26 July 2013
HUNTINGFIELD MILLENNIUM GREEN CIO Received: On time
TOWN ESTATE Received: On time
THE HUNTINGFIELD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Alison Britton Chair 29 April 2014 None on record
David Borer Trustee 24 April 2018
RUMBURGH & ST. MICHAEL VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE Received: On time
Evelyn Lindqvist Trustee 28 April 2015 None on record
Nigel George Frostick Trustee 12 October 2019 None on record
Natalie Lloyd-Evans Trustee 26 January 2016 None on record