BASINGSTOKE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1154319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £38.49k £39.68k £31.73k £40.68k £189.27k
Total expenditure £25.12k £25.60k £29.45k £34.23k £47.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.17k N/A N/A N/A