BASINGSTOKE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1154319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILIP JOHN THOMAS Chair 24 April 2016 None on record
PETER VALLANCE Trustee 03 September 2013 None on record
ANDREW MICHAEL Macqueen Trustee 14 August 2018 None on record
JEANNE HISCOCK Trustee 15 December 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF WINKLEBURY AND WORTING Received: On time
ADRIAN WEBB Trustee 20 October 2016 None on record
Paul Gross Trustee 12 August 2021 None on record
PATRICK FRANCIS MURPHY Trustee 21 February 2019 None on record