THE PAROCHIAL COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN WITH ST MARTIN, YORK

Charity number: 1153456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £74.63k £102.49k £96.57k £69.43k £53.04k
Total expenditure £80.23k £98.95k £97.30k £43.45k £62.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A