Trustees THE PAROCHIAL COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN WITH ST MARTIN, YORK
Charity number: 1153456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Elizabeth Claire Hassall | Chair | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wanda Elizabeth Manley GSM | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Richard Julian | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicole Dominique Marie Gladstone | Trustee | 26 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Patrick Jonathan Yeo Marshall | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev David John Hobman | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ann Hardaker | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Hammersley | Trustee | 15 August 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.