FULL FACT

Charity number: 1158683
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anna Cook Trustee 13 November 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR JEAN SEATON Trustee 03 September 2013 None on record
LORD INGLEWOOD Trustee 03 June 2014 None on record
LORD SHARKEY Trustee 03 June 2014 None on record
Sharon Fae Witherspoon Trustee 13 January 2016 None on record
Anand Menon Trustee 13 November 2019 None on record
THE HON MICHAEL JOHN SAMUEL Chair 03 September 2013
THE HON A G SAMUEL CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE PETER SAMUEL ROYAL FREE FUND Charity reporting is up to date
PETER SAMUEL CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
COL WILFRED HORATIO MICHOLLS DECEASED CHARITABLE TRUST FUND Charity reporting is up to date
THE M J SAMUEL CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Tim Gordon Trustee 13 November 2019 None on record
Baroness Janet Royall Trustee 13 November 2019
THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF SOMERVILLE COLLEGE Charity reporting is up to date
CHARLES AND JULIA HENRY FUND
James Paul Harding Trustee 03 July 2019
THE DAIWA ANGLO-JAPANESE FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
SIMON BRISCOE Trustee 03 September 2013
ROYAL STATISTICAL SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date