Friends of Five Acre Wood and Grow 19

Charity number: 1153151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £80.56k £43.19k £88.08k £142.46k £123.74k
Total expenditure £88.95k £20.61k £67.73k £66.49k £99.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A