Friends of Five Acre Wood and Grow 19

Charity number: 1153151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SARAH OAKES Trustee 05 March 2019 None on record
Sally Moor Trustee 23 March 2016
FRIENDS OF FIVE ACRE WOOD AND GROW 19 Recently registered
KRISTIE ROBINSON Trustee 27 March 2018
FRIENDS OF FIVE ACRE WOOD AND GROW 19 Recently registered
Timothy Williams Chair 15 June 2021 None on record
Julie Quinton Trustee 15 June 2021 None on record
David Smith Trustee 03 March 2020 None on record