GATEWAY CHURCH, MORECAMBE

Charity number: 1154420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £22.29k £22.54k £20.38k £19.32k £31.13k
Total expenditure £25.96k £20.13k £24.27k £18.75k £18.06k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A