GATEWAY CHURCH, MORECAMBE

Charity number: 1154420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carole Clayton Trustee 16 July 2014 None on record
Denise Mosop Trustee 16 October 2019 None on record
LORRAINE PATIENCE Trustee 07 October 2021
MARANATHA CHRISTIAN OUTREACH MINISTRIES Received: On time
Alister Patience Trustee 07 October 2021 None on record
Fiona Collins Trustee 12 May 2021 None on record
JOHN CLAYTON Trustee 16 July 2014 None on record
Peter Collins Chair 27 May 2020 None on record