HORNSEA FLORAL HALL

Charity number: 1154950
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD CARMICHAEL Chair 05 November 2013 None on record
Violet Joan Gales Trustee 25 March 2021 None on record
ROSIE THOMPSON Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record
Michael Walker Trustee 01 March 2020 None on record
ANNE LANCELEY ELISE PADGETT Trustee 05 November 2013 None on record
Brett Alan North Trustee 05 November 2013
1ST HORNSEA SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
Nadia Bridges Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Pauline Frances Spensley Trustee 01 June 2017 None on record
Sheila Wallace-Marshall Trustee 10 July 2014 None on record
PETA KILBANE Trustee 06 March 2014 None on record