ST JOHNS COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1157700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £25.31k £25.00k £25.00k £24.56k £25.56k
Total expenditure £22.03k £21.58k £24.61k £24.61k £25.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £500 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.17k N/A N/A N/A