ST JOHNS COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1157700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Anne Hudson Trustee 08 September 2013 None on record
ROBERT CLARKE Trustee 01 September 2010 None on record
COLIN JOHN ROSS Trustee 01 September 1999 None on record
ANNE SCOTT Trustee 01 September 1999 None on record
VANESSA OWEN Chair 19 September 1999 None on record
James evans Lloyd Trustee 08 September 2018 None on record
IONA THOMAS Trustee 01 September 1999 None on record
MR PHILLIP TALLETT Trustee 19 September 1999 None on record