ST JOHNS COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1157700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 April 2019 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 09 November 2016 On time Download