THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANNE (HEYHOUSES), ST ANNES-ON-SEA, LANCASHIRE.

Charity number: 1155188
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 November 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 November 2020 27 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 24 July 2016 On time Download