THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANNE (HEYHOUSES), ST ANNES-ON-SEA, LANCASHIRE.

Charity number: 1155188
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janice Vause Trustee 22 April 2019 None on record
WILLIAM MORRIS THOMAS Trustee 05 June 2017 None on record
FR DAVID LYON Chair 30 December 2013 None on record
Peter Duke Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
WILLIAM MARTIN COUSINS Trustee 05 June 2017 None on record
William Henry Claude Hembrow Trustee 16 January 2017 None on record
Winston James Atkinson Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
DENISE ANN DUKE Trustee 30 December 2013 None on record
Jennifer Nuttall Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
John W Pitches Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
PAMELA KINGHORN Trustee 09 May 2016 None on record
Margaret Imrie Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Susan McMahon Trustee 01 May 2019 None on record
Lesley Ann Dawson Trustee 29 April 2019 None on record
RICHARD WOOLLEY BAKER Trustee 30 December 2013 None on record
Adrian Stephen Page Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Brian Hankinson Trustee 04 June 2018 None on record
Ann Fletcher Trustee 25 January 2021 None on record
Fiona Margaret Wilson Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record