THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANNE (HEYHOUSES), ST ANNES-ON-SEA, LANCASHIRE.

Charity number: 1155188
Charity reporting is up to date (27 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £164.20k £171.68k £183.66k £193.82k £189.73k
Total expenditure £163.18k £165.29k £200.59k £206.99k £211.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A