GATEHOUSE - CARING IN EAST ANGLIA

Charity number: 1154412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 January 2017 On time Download