Governing document THE STRETTONS CIVIC SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/12/1974 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/1987 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/1991 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/1992 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/2011
Charitable objects
(I)TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT.(II) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE ENVIRONMENT OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT (INCLUDING ITS GEOGRAPHY,HISTORY,NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE) AND TO FOSTER CIVIC PRIDE.(III)TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION,PROTECTION,DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF NATURAL BEAUTY AND FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA BENEFIT. (IV)TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND ECONOMIC WELL-BEING OF RESIDENTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHURCH STRETTON AND SURROUNDING HILLS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.