Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY EMERGENCY FOODBANK

Charity number: 1153907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 13 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 09 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 09 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 07 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window