Financial history BRAMWELL MEMORIAL PARISH INSTITUTE

Charity number: 504122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.15k £8.04k £7.64k £12.85k £11.15k
Total expenditure £7.47k £8.57k £4.46k £10.02k £2.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.00k £10.00k