Trustees BRAMWELL MEMORIAL PARISH INSTITUTE

Charity number: 504122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR STUART FOSTER JAGGER Chair 29 October 2012
None on record
Tim Barnes Trustee 31 March 2021
None on record
David Graham Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Katherine Hannant Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Peter Siegram Van Burgh Trustee 14 November 2016
None on record
NEIL WALSH Trustee 14 November 2016
None on record
JANET LOUISE WARWICK Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record
PETER STUBBINGTON Trustee
BUXTON DRAMA LEAGUE
Received: 5 days late
JANET MARGARET QUIER Trustee
None on record