HOME-START SURREY

Charity number: 1154913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 October 2017 On time Download