Financial history ST JOHN'S COMMON ROOM

Charity number: 1155621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £112.43k £114.19k £113.08k £52.56k £91.79k
Total expenditure £96.57k £116.46k £130.78k £43.58k £80.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A