Accounts and annual returns VELEHRAD LONDON

Charity number: 1154836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 24 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window