FOUNDATION FOR ACTIVE COMMUNITY ENGAGEMENT

Charity number: 1156904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 November 2017 On time Download