FOUNDATION FOR ACTIVE COMMUNITY ENGAGEMENT

Charity number: 1156904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rob Sharp Trustee 26 June 2016 None on record
MR TIM WATTS Chair 31 January 2014 None on record
Jillian Hoggans Trustee 09 April 2016
SOUTHMEAD DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: On time
Rosie Greenwood Trustee 04 February 2019 None on record
Brenda Langley Trustee 20 August 2019 None on record
Rev Simon Edwards Trustee 26 September 2018
ST ANDREW'S METHODIST EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Rev Hilary Cooke Trustee 10 August 2014
BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time